+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2019.
- Chapter 26, 2019 Laws.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Nearman, Post, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 4--Bynum, Keny-Guyer, Leif, Piluso.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to April 1, 2019 Calendar.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, President Courtney, Thomsen.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/27/2019 4:54 PM)