+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter 727, 2013 Laws.
- Effective date, August 14, 2013.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 3--Boquist, Ferrioli, George; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Starr.
- (Amendments distributed.)
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed.Ayes, 46; Nays, 12--Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Kennemer, McLane, Richardson, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Boone, Keny-Guyer.
- Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Smith.
On July 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor