+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2015.
- Chapter 606, 2015 Laws.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 6--Barreto, Heard, McLane, Post, Stark, Weidner; Excused, 1--Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Knopp, Olsen, Thomsen.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment #
6/11/2015 2:52:59 PM
Amendment #7488
6/11/2015 2:52:59 PM
Amendment #7110
6/1/2015 9:06:03 AM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor