+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 658, 2021 Laws.
- Effective date, July 27, 2021.
On July 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
- Second reading.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (6/24/2021 2:21 PM)