+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 1, 2013.
- Chapter 542, 2013 Laws.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Conger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Hanna.
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Boquist, George.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Ways And Means
Type:
Primary Sponsor