+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, August 9, 2019.
- Chapter 688, 2019 Laws.
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 3, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 20--Barker, Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Meek, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Zika; Excused, 7--Clem, Greenlick, Hernandez, McKeown, Noble, Smith DB, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Wilson.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation filed by Manning Jr.
- Heard granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay.
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boles, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Cancelled.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (6/11/2019 10:02 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (6/13/2019 4:45 PM)