+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 27, 2015.
- Chapter 766, 2015 Laws.
On July 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 9--Barreto, Bentz, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Krieger, Sprenger, Weidner, Wilson.
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (8)
Amendment #7836
6/28/2015 6:57:32 PM
Amendment #7608
6/18/2015 9:33:28 AM
Amendment #7607
6/18/2015 9:33:16 AM
Amendment #7606
6/18/2015 9:33:04 AM
Amendment #7604
6/18/2015 9:32:52 AM
Amendment #7605
6/18/2015 9:32:52 AM
Amendment #6570
5/12/2015 12:04:19 PM
Amendment #6525
5/12/2015 2:55:41 PM
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor