+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, October 7, 2013.
- Chapter 343, 2013 Laws.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Conger. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Garrett, Olson.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2013 Calendar.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Devlin.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #849
Not Adopted
Amendment #992
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor