+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Veto sustained in accordance with Art. V, sec. 15b, Oregon Constitution.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2014.
- Chapter 491, 2013 Laws.
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's veto message entered into Journal.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed with line-item veto.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 7--Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Knopp, Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 1--Johnson.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Finance And Revenue
Type:
Primary Sponsor