+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2014.
- Chapter 483, 2013 Laws.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Parrish. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Lively; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Garrett, Olson, Williamson.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2013 Calendar.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation and Economic Development.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Business And Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor