+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 225, 2019 Laws.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boles, Helm; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 22, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 21, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 17, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 20, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 17, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Gelser, Thomsen.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.