+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 341, 2017 Laws.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Vial. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Kennemer, Smith G.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/28/2017 4:33:26 PM)