+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, July 27, 2021.
- Chapter 644, 2021 Laws.
On July 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Salinas. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 1--Smith G.
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
- Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Education.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/5/2021 3:55 PM)