+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 175, 2021 Laws.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 60.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2021 Calendar.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Carried over to May 20, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Informational Meeting held.
- Work Session held.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Education.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Johnson, Thatcher.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/1/2021 10:58 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/21/2021 2:08 PM)