+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, October 7, 2013.
- Chapter 447, 2013 Laws.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Esquivel.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 11, 2013 Calendar.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by George. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Devlin.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.