+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Olsen, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (5/9/2019 7:45 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/6/2019 5:02 PM)