+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/4/2019 9:10 AM)
Amendment -1
Combined (4/1/2019 9:51 AM)
Amendment -2
Combined (4/1/2019 9:51 AM)