+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, September 25, 2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 104, 2021 Laws.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Zika; Excused, 3--Lively, Sanchez, Wright.
- Motion to refer to Ways and Means failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 35--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Clem, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 3--Lively, Sanchez, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Leif.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 35--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Clem, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gomberg, Grayber, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nathanson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Rayfield, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sollman, Speaker Kotek, Valderrama, Wilde, Williams, Witt; Excused, 2--Lively, Sanchez.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill and be printed B-Engrossed.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 16; Nays, 11--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 2--Manning Jr, Thomsen.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment -AMR5
Proposed (5/11/2021 3:15 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/2/2021 7:08 AM)
Amendment -A3
Proposed (5/7/2021 12:31 PM)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (5/7/2021 11:08 AM)