+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 16, 2015.
- Chapter 454, 2015 Laws.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 44; Nays, 5--Post, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 4--Buehler, Gorsek, Hack, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bentz, Davis, McKeown, Nearman, Sprenger, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2015 Calendar.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2015 Calendar.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #4956
3/31/2015 1:30:29 PM
Amendment #4848
3/26/2015 2:07:07 PM
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor