+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #5105
4/6/2015 9:02:34 AM
Amendment #4872
3/30/2015 1:40:54 PM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor