+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, May 16, 2013.
- Chapter 154, 2013 Laws.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hicks. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Hanna; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Beyer.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #335
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor