+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 6, 2017.
- Chapter 252, 2017 Laws.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Kennemer, Smith G.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Boquist, Johnson, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-14 by unanimous consent.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Not Adopted (4/9/2013 9:16:25 AM)