+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 336, 2017 Laws.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 19--Barreto, Buehler, Esquivel, Evans, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, McLane, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 5--Boone, Gorsek, Nearman, Piluso, Sprenger; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bentz.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Business and Transportation be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care, then Business and Transportation.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/11/2017 2:59:02 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor