+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (3)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (12)
Amendment -A21
Proposed (6/18/2015 8:57:58 AM)
Amendment -A20
Adopted (6/24/2015 11:11:52 AM)
Amendment -A17
Proposed (6/8/2015 2:45:52 PM)
Amendment -A16
Proposed (6/8/2015 1:43:26 PM)
Amendment -A18
Proposed (6/8/2015 1:43:26 PM)
Amendment -MR15
Proposed (4/22/2015 10:30:01 AM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (3/18/2015 12:27:22 PM)
Amendment -12
Adopted (4/15/2015 10:17:21 AM)
Amendment -11
Proposed (4/10/2015 4:39:49 PM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (3/18/2015 8:50:32 AM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (3/18/2015 9:06:11 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/26/2015 4:09:44 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor