+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #5524
4/14/2015 8:08:43 AM
Amendment #4718
3/24/2015 9:59:10 AM
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor