+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 295, 2019 Laws.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Boles, Williamson.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services and Housing.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--President Courtney.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -5
Adopted (4/8/2019 12:26 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/25/2019 2:23 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/25/2019 2:24 PM)