+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 20, 2019.
- Chapter 461, 2019 Laws.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Keny-Guyer, Prusak, Smith Warner.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing cancelled.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Johnson, President Courtney, Steiner Hayward, Thomsen.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (5/21/2019 10:25 AM)