+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 6, 2013.
- Chapter 342, 2013 Laws.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barnhart, Gelser, Whitsett.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care and Human Services.
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (9)
Amendment #1885
Adopted
Amendment #1790
Adopted
Amendment #1884
Adopted
Amendment #1513
Not Adopted
Amendment #1503
Not Adopted
Amendment #1512
Not Adopted
Amendment #272
Not Adopted
Amendment #1502
Not Adopted
Amendment #271
Not Adopted