+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2014.
- Chapter 469, 2013 Laws.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Garrett. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2013 Calendar.
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2013 Calendar.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2013 Calendar.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2013 Calendar.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2013 Calendar.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 4, 2013 Calendar.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2013 Calendar.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--George, Shields, Whitsett; excused, 1--Steiner Hayward.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #1079
Adopted
Amendment #691
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor