+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to refer to Ways and Means carried by unanimous consent.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/5/2019 4:50 PM)
Amendment 3
Proposed (4/5/2019 4:50 PM)