+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 549, 2019 Laws.
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed. Ayes, 41; Nays, 16--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Leif; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Findley, Speaker Kotek.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 13, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Hansell.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-05 by unanimous consent.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education, then Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -5
Adopted (5/17/2019 3:18 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (5/10/2019 8:27 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/29/2019 3:57 PM)