+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, September 25, 2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chapter 72, 2021 Laws.
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Clem, Hayden, Lively, Nearman, Stark.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2021 Calendar.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Manning Jr, Thomsen.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Cancelled.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.