+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor