+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 332, 2019 Laws.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 3--Boles, Keny-Guyer, Smith DB; Excused for Business of the House, 3--McKeown, Nathanson, Speaker Kotek.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Johnson; Excused, 2--Fagan, President Courtney.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.