+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 125, 2019 Laws.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Smith DB; Excused, 1--Drazan.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2019 Calendar.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2019 Calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 2, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 1, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Olsen; Excused, 2--Beyer, Knopp.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/5/2019 11:53 AM)