+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective Date, September 29, 2019.
- Chapter 177, 2019 Laws.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2019 Calendar.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2019 Calendar.
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 2, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 1, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Fagan, President Courtney.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.