+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective Date, September 29, 2019.
- Chapter 458, 2019 Laws.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Marsh.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed B-Eng.)
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to rerefer to Environment and Natural Resources carried by voice vote.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (3/30/2019 12:14 PM)
Amendment A3
Proposed (3/30/2019 12:14 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/19/2019 9:43 AM)