+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 005, 2015 Laws.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 39; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Davis, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 13--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
- Motion to rerefer to Business and Transportation failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney.
- Motion to substitute Minority Report for Committee Report failed.Ayes, 12; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority)
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (not concurring Girod and Thomsen) (Printed A-Eng).
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment #4172
3/3/2015 10:37:03 AM
Amendment #3918
2/12/2015 11:49:36 AM
Amendment #3845
2/9/2015 8:01:51 AM
Amendment #3826
2/5/2015 3:17:37 PM
Amendment #3844
2/9/2015 8:01:51 AM
Amendment #3781
1/28/2015 2:50:50 PM