+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 457, 2019 Laws.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 19--Barreto, Boles, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Marsh.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Taylor.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 06-03 by unanimous consent.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/19/2019 9:32 AM)