+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, August 2, 2017.
- Chapter 647, 2017 Laws.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 10, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Malstrom. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Kennemer, McKeown.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2017 Calendar.
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to July 5, 2017 Calendar.
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/7/2017 2:27:03 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor