+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 330, 2019 Laws.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Burdick, Olsen, President Courtney, Taylor, Winters.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.