+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 548, 2019 Laws.
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 29, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Fahey; Excused, 1--Clem.
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Revenue.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 3--Boquist, Johnson, Steiner Hayward.
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session cancelled.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance and Revenue by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Finance and Revenue. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/21/2019 10:40 AM)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (5/21/2019 12:16 PM)