+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 014, 2015 Laws.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Fagan, Gomberg, Holvey, Lininger, Lively, Parrish, Taylor; Excused, 2--Buckley, Williamson.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 11, 2015 Calendar.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to March 9, 2015 Calendar.
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Second reading.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Shields.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.