+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Thomsen, Winters.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -6
Adopted (4/3/2019 2:56 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/25/2019 4:45 PM)