+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 10, 2015.
- Chapter 350, 2015 Laws.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Beyer, Johnson.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barton. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Read.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2015 Calendar.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2015 Calendar.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2015 Calendar.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 20, 2015 Calendar.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2015 Calendar.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 14, 2015 Calendar.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #
5/6/2015 1:23:52 PM
Amendment #6483
5/6/2015 1:23:52 PM
Amendment #4888
3/30/2015 8:54:40 AM
Amendment #4322
3/9/2015 4:50:58 PM
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor