+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #1955
Not Adopted
Amendment #1785
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor