+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 13, 2019 Laws.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--McLain, McLane, Witt.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Olsen; Excused, 1--Thomsen.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (1/22/2019 5:04 PM)