+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, May 23, 2013.
- Chapter 227, 2013 Laws.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Thatcher; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Fagan.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans' Services and Emergency Preparedness.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 25; excused, 5--Baertschiger, Bates, Devlin, Ferrioli, Olsen.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #760
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
(Presession Filed)
Type:
Primary Sponsor