+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, May 19, 2021.
- Chapter 42, 2021 Laws.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Wallan; Excused, 3--Alonso Leon, Nearman, Power.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, Heard, Johnson.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Labor and Business.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (1/25/2021 5:02 PM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (2/1/2021 4:48 PM)