+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 328, 2017 Laws.
- Effective date, October 6, 2017.
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Hayden, Parrish; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 31, 2017 Calendar.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2017 Calendar.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2017 Calendar.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2017 Calendar.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 26; excused, 4--DeBoer, Frederick, Johnson, Thatcher.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -2
Adopted (3/10/2017 2:26:07 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (2/20/2017 10:05:13 AM)